+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
- House/ filed
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted/ amend
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2016: House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2016: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor