+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- Senate/ received from House
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ to Senate
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 20, 2017 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
March 1, 2018: Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
March 1, 2018: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2018: House/ substituted
February 26, 2018: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 9
February 26, 2018: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
February 26, 2018: House/ uncircled
February 22, 2018: House/ circled
February 9, 2018: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
February 9, 2018: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor