+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ strike enacting clause
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (3)
House Amendment # 3 (Verbal)
Passed
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
House Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2013: House/ floor amendment
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 11
March 8, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 9
March 4, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor