+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (52)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 1
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ held
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (15)
February 22, 2021: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 4
February 19, 2021: Senate/ uncircled
February 19, 2021: Senate/ circled
February 19, 2021: Senate/ floor amendment # 1
February 19, 2021: Senate/ motion to reconsider
February 19, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 7
February 19, 2021: Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
February 18, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 3, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 5
February 3, 2021: House/ substituted from # 2 to # 3
January 27, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2021: House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 3
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 3