+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ substituted by Rules Committee
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
On January 21, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 9, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor