+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ to House
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to Rules Committee
- Senate/ comm rpt sent to Rules Committee
On February 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House/ read 2nd time
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 29, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 7
February 13, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor