+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- House/ notification of bill tabled
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 3, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Lifted from Table
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Substitute Recommended by Standing Comm
- House Comm - Tabled
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2006: House Comm - Tabled
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 24, 2006: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor