+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (36)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ substituted
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
- Senate Comm - Returned to Rules
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Held
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ substituted
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
March 13, 2014: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2014: Senate/ substituted
March 7, 2014: Senate Comm - Held
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2014: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2014: House/ substituted
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 6
February 19, 2014: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor