+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time returned to Rules Comm
- House/ comm report/ sent to Rules Committee
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Not Considered
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
February 25, 2004: House Comm - Returned to Rules
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor