+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ strike enacting clause
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Returned to Rules
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 23, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 4, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor