+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Net effect of amendments is no change to the bill
- Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 0
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- House/ held
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 17, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2022: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 29
March 3, 2022: Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 0
February 17, 2022: Senate/ circled
February 15, 2022: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 15, 2022: Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
February 1, 2022: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
January 25, 2022: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor