+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (54)
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 21, 2010 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 20, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ lifted from table
- Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
On February 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ motion to reconsider passed
- House/ motion to reconsider
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- House/ filed
- House/ failed
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ 3rd reading
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ amended
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 7, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 29, 2009 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On December 28, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On December 23, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On December 14, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 10, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On November 20, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 19, 2009 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Amendments (3)
House Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
House Amendment # 2
Passed
Senate Amendment # 3
Passed
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 2010: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 17, 2010: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
February 5, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 1, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2010: House/ failed
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 2
January 26, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor