+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
- House/ to Governor
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- House/ received from Senate
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2021: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 24, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 18, 2021: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 11, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 70
- Absent: 5
February 4, 2021: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 3
February 4, 2021: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 10
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor