+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 2
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House/ 2nd reading
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 8, 2016 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 5, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On December 28, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment 2
Passed
Senate Committee Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (9)
March 4, 2016: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 66
- Absent: 9
March 3, 2016: Senate/ uncircled
March 3, 2016: Senate/ circled
March 3, 2016: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
March 2, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 8
March 2, 2016: Senate/ floor amendment # 2
February 25, 2016: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 3
February 11, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 1, 2016: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor