+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ to Governor
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ floor amendment
- House/ to Senate
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 2, 2011 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
House Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2011: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2011: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 4
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2011: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
February 14, 2011: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2011: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor