+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ enacting clause struck
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Vote
February 9, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor