+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ to House
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Senate/ 2nd reading
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 1
Passed
+ − Votes (8)
March 11, 2013: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2013: Senate/ floor amendment
March 8, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
March 8, 2013: Senate/ circled
March 7, 2013: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 7
March 5, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 5
February 11, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor