+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 26, 2010 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- House/ to Senate
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 24, 2010 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ uncircled
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ motion to reconsider
- Senate/ failed
- Senate/ held for reconsideration
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ motion to reconsider passed
- Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ circled
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
Senate Amendment # 1
Committee Amendments Prepared
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2010: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
February 23, 2010: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2010: Senate/ failed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 3
February 16, 2010: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
February 9, 2010: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 4, 2010: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor