+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- House/ filed
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ enacting clause struck
- Senate/ to House
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
- Senate/ placed on 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ substitute/ amended
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On January 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
On January 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On January 19, 2006 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
- House/ amended
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ read 2nd time
On January 17, 2006 in the House:
- House/ committee report favorable
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 16, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
On January 13, 2006 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 12, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
- Numbered
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2006: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
January 19, 2006: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
January 17, 2006: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor