+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ received from House
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ uncircled
- Senate/ circled
- Senate/ 3rd reading
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Substituted by Standing Committee
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Not Considered
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ committee report favorable
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
- Numbered Bill Publically Distributed
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2013: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 3
February 26, 2013: Senate/ circled
February 26, 2013: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 2
February 26, 2013: Senate/ uncircled
February 20, 2013: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2013: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 6
February 6, 2013: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor