+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- House/ to Governor
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ concurs with Senate amendment
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 3rd reading
- Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Senate/ to House with amendments
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd reading
- Senate/ floor amendment # 2
- Senate/ passed 2nd reading
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate/ committee report favorable
- Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- House/ to Senate
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ floor amendment # 1
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ held
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
- House/ circled
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House/ comm rpt/ substituted
- House/ 2nd reading
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Research
On December 22, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On December 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment 2
Passed
House Floor Amendment 1
Passed
+ − Votes (14)
February 24, 2017: House/ concurs with Senate amendment
- Yeas: 71
- Absent: 4
February 23, 2017: Senate/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 25
- Absent: 4
February 22, 2017: Senate/ floor amendment # 2
February 22, 2017: Senate/ passed 2nd reading
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
February 17, 2017: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 3
- Absent: 4
February 10, 2017: House/ uncircled
February 10, 2017: House/ floor amendment # 1
February 10, 2017: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 68
- Absent: 7
February 8, 2017: House/ substituted
February 8, 2017: House/ circled
February 8, 2017: House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2
January 30, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2017: House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 1
January 30, 2017: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor