+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On March 10, 2004 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Pass Review Forward for Enrolling
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Enroll Draft
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Received from House for Enrolling
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 3rd
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On January 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ comm report/ placed on Consent Cal
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ to Senate
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ comm report favorable/ amended
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to standing committee
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 15, 2004 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- House/ received fiscal note from LFA
On January 9, 2004 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 15, 2003 in the House:
- Bill Distributed
On December 9, 2003 in the House:
- Numbered
+ − Votes (4)
February 4, 2004: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 5
January 29, 2004: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 23, 2004: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 69
- Absent: 6
January 20, 2004: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor