+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 3rd
- Senate/ read 3rd
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 2nd
- Senate/ pass 2nd
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ comm report/ amended
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to standing committee
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ read 3rd time
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ read 2nd time
- House/ under suspension of the rules
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- House/ received from General Counsel
On December 19, 2006 in the House:
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On December 14, 2006 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
On December 12, 2006 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
On December 4, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
On November 16, 2006 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
+ − Votes (5)
February 5, 2007: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
February 1, 2007: Senate/ pass 3rd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 31, 2007: Senate/ pass 2nd
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2007: Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
January 16, 2007: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 73
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor