+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
- Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar
- Senate/ to House
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House/ uncircled
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- House/ circled
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 9, 2016: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 29
February 8, 2016: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 74
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2016: House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1
February 8, 2016: House/ uncircled
February 5, 2016: House/ circled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor