+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received enrolled bill from Printing
- House/ to Governor
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received from Senate
- House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate/ received from House
- Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced)
- Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House
- Senate/ to House
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- House/ uncircled
- House/ floor amendment # 3
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ 2nd reading
- House/ 3rd reading
- House/ circled
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- House/ received bill from Legislative Printing
- House/ 1st reading (Introduced)
On January 16, 2021 in the House:
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
- LFA/ fiscal note publicly available
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
- Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
January 28, 2021: Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2021: House/ floor amendment # 3
January 27, 2021: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2021: House/ uncircled
January 22, 2021: House/ circled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor