+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 17, 2008 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Governor
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- House/ enrolled bill to Printing
- Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to Senate
- House/ concurs with Senate amendments
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ signed by President to House
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- House/ signed by Speaker sent for enrolling
- Bill Received from House for Enrolling
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar
- House/ received from Senate
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ to House with amendments
- Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Senate/ floor amendment
- Senate/ read 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ from Rules Committee to 2nd
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate/ read 1st (Introduced)
- Senate/ received from House
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 3rd time
- House/ passed 3rd reading
- House/ to Senate
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 2nd time (Under Suspension)
- House/ Rules Committee to 3rd Reading Calendar
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to floor
- LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis
- LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input
- House Comm - Substitute Recommendation
- House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- House/ comm report favorable/ substituted
- House/ read 2nd time
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- House Comm - Held
- House Comm - Amendment Recommendation
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- House/ to standing committee
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print
- House/ to Printing with fiscal note
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- House/ read 1st time (Introduced)
- House/ received from General Counsel
On January 22, 2008 in the House:
- Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi
- Bill Numbered but not Distributed
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment # 2
Passed
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2008: House/ concurs with Senate amendments
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 12
March 4, 2008: Senate/ pass 2nd & 3rd (Suspension)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 27, 2008: House/ passed 3rd reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 8
February 20, 2008: House Comm - Favorable Recommendation
- Yeas: 11
- Absent: 4
February 13, 2008: House Comm - Held
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor