+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On September 21, 1993 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 20, 1993 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 204.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment. Without written report.
On September 15, 1993 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 29, 1993 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts and Administrative Practice.
On April 19, 1993 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor