+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On May 22, 1986 in the House:
- Resolution Agreed to in House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Energy and Commerce Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On April 16, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Consumer Protection and Finance.
On April 8, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
On March 25, 1986 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On March 24, 1986 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 575.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Danforth without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
On March 13, 1986 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On December 13, 1985 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor