+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On August 18, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-103.
- Signed by President.
On August 10, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On August 7, 1987 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On August 6, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On June 29, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On June 29, 1987 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 25, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On June 23, 1987 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 185.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 17, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor