+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On September 30, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On September 9, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on House Administration, H. Rept. 94-1486.
On February 26, 1976 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
On February 25, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On February 24, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 94-644.
On January 19, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor