+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On November 7, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
On October 28, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
On October 25, 1985 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On October 24, 1985 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 361.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Lugar without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
On October 23, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 5, 1985 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor