+ − Actions (7)
On July 13, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On July 8, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On June 25, 1981 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amendment to the preamble by Voice Vote.
On June 24, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 184.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably with an amendment and an amendment to the title and an amendment to the preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On April 29, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor