+ − Actions (7)
On April 16, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
On April 5, 1982 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
On April 1, 1982 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Percy without amendment. Without written report.
On March 30, 1982 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On March 15, 1982 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor