+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On September 20, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered reported an original joint resolution in lieu of this measure.
On August 2, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On June 23, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings concluded. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 98-174 Pt. 2.
On June 22, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
On June 21, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held.
On February 3, 1983 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor