+ − Actions (8)
On May 19, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On May 12, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On May 8, 1981 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On May 7, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 81.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On May 5, 1981 in the Senate:
- Committee on Judiciary. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On March 12, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor