+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 27, 1986 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 99-532.
- Signed by President.
On October 16, 1986 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On October 15, 1986 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 8, 1986 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
On October 2, 1986 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
On October 1, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- H.AMDT.1271 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Unanimous Consent.
- H.AMDT.1271 Amendment Offered by Representative Garcia. An amendment to change the designated day to March 25, 1987.
On April 22, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On April 8, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On March 25, 1986 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.1271
An amendment to change the designated day to March 25, 1987.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor