+ − Summary
+ − Actions (19)
On October 14, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-418.
- Signed by President.
On October 9, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 1, 1992 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate.
On September 30, 1992 in the House:
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Mr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On June 30, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On June 29, 1992 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the House.
On June 26, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On June 25, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 501.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 1, 1992 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor