+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 5, 1988 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Insular and International Affairs.
On March 29, 1988 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
On March 29, 1988 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On March 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On March 23, 1988 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 598.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with a preamble. With written report No. 100-307.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On January 28, 1988 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
On December 9, 1987 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor