+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On February 28, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Committee consideration and Mark Up Session held.
On February 22, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Hearings held.
On February 16, 1983 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Rules.
On January 27, 1983 in the Senate:
- Committee on Governmental Affairs. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Roth. Without written report.
- Committee on Governmental Affairs ordered to be reported an original measure.
On January 26, 1983 in the Senate:
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor