+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On August 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Star Print ordered on on the resolution.
On July 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent.
On June 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 242.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
On June 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor