+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 30, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On April 14, 1986 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On April 11, 1986 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title and an amended preamble by Voice Vote.
On April 10, 1986 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 608.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond with an amendment and an amendment to the title and an amended preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
On September 13, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor