+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On November 28, 1989 in the House:
- See H.J.Res.357 .
On October 10, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Libraries and Memorials.
On October 3, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
- Received in the House.
On October 3, 1989 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 2, 1989 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 28, 1989 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 267.
- Committee on Rules. Reported to Senate by Senator Ford without amendment. With written report No. 101-146.
On September 27, 1989 in the Senate:
- Committee on Rules. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On September 20, 1989 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor