+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On July 25, 1980 in the Senate:
- Public Law 96-313.
- Signed by President.
On July 24, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On July 23, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On July 23, 1980 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On July 22, 1980 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Committee on House Administration discharged in House.
On June 27, 1980 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
On June 26, 1980 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On June 18, 1980 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 96-819.
On June 4, 1980 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor