+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 16, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Space Science Applications.
On December 13, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
On December 2, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science and Technology.
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
On November 21, 1985 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote.
On November 14, 1985 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 408.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Lugar with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amended preamble. Without written report.
On November 13, 1985 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On July 26, 1985 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor