+ − Actions (14)
On February 26, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-149.
- Signed by President.
On February 24, 1982 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
On February 23, 1982 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On February 10, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On December 16, 1981 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On December 16, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On December 15, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 421.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On December 10, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor