+ − Summary
+ − Actions (11)
On August 30, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On August 10, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on House Administration, H. Rept. 94-1412.
On June 11, 1976 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
On June 10, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On June 3, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration with amendment, S. Rept. 94-929.
On May 5, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Foreign Relations, S. Rept. 94-781.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor