+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/27/2017 S6191)
- S.Amdt.1103 Amendment SA 1103 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.1103 Amendment SA 1103 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S6140; text: CR S6140) To recognize that charities, non-profit organizations, religious organizations, and businesses of the United States have an important role in addressing humanitarian crises.
- The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6143)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6143-6144)
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 115.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text as introduced in Senate: CR S2368-2369)
+ − Amendments (2)
SA 1103
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.
S.Amdt.1103
No description has been published. See Text of Amendment as Submitted.