+ − Actions (16)
On October 14, 1982 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 97-316.
- Signed by President.
On October 5, 1982 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On October 1, 1982 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- Senate agreed to the House amendments by Voice Vote.
On September 21, 1982 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House by Unanimous Consent.
- House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service Discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On November 10, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On November 2, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
On October 30, 1981 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
On October 27, 1981 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 347.
- Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Thurmond favorably without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
- Committee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 6, 1981 in the Senate:
- Read second time and referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor