+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On May 1, 1989 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 101-20.
- Signed by President.
On April 27, 1989 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On April 25, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Census and Population Discharged.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
- Mr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On April 24, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On April 6, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Received in the House.
On April 6, 1989 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 5, 1989 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On April 4, 1989 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 36.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor