+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On August 3, 1992 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 102-331.
- Signed by President.
On July 29, 1992 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 28, 1992 in the House:
- Message on House action received in Senate.
On July 24, 1992 in the House:
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged.
- Mr. Sawyer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Cleared for White House.
On July 10, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Census and Population.
On June 27, 1991 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Referred to the House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
- Received in the House.
On June 26, 1991 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On March 12, 1991 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor